MA S1294 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-5)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-26 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-26 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to strengthening the local and regional public health system. Public Health.
Title
Relative to strengthening the local and regional public health system
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-26 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2019-04-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H876 (Similar To) 2019-10-15 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H193 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - Accompanied S112
H1841 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
H2962 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H729 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2060 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H341 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H190 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H2187 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2189 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1470 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1928 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H1262 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4974
S1617 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
S2192 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2203
S2195 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 27 of the Acts of 2019
S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2203 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2213
S2221 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2531
S2225 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4468
H3974 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4073
S2321 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - House concurred
H4179 (Similar To) 2020-07-31 - Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading
S2437 (Similar To) 2020-01-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 15 of the Acts of 2020
S2446 (Similar To) 2021-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 321 of the Acts of 2020
H193 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - Accompanied S112
H1841 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
H2962 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H729 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2060 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H341 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H190 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H2187 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2189 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1470 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1928 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H1262 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4974
S1617 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
S2192 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2203
S2195 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 27 of the Acts of 2019
S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2203 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2213
S2221 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2531
S2225 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4468
H3974 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4073
S2321 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - House concurred
H4179 (Similar To) 2020-07-31 - Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading
S2437 (Similar To) 2020-01-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 15 of the Acts of 2020
S2446 (Similar To) 2021-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 321 of the Acts of 2020
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1294 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1294.pdf |