MA H982 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5160
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to healthcare coverage standards for children under private insurance. Financial Services.
Title
To provide early and periodic screening, diagnosis and treatment to privately insured children under the age of 21
Sponsors
Rep. Sean Garballey [D] | Rep. Brian Ashe [D] | Rep. Steven Ultrino [D] | Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D] |
Rep. Denise Provost [D] | Rep. Thomas Stanley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-01 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5160 |
2019-11-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/18/2019 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H328 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H3352 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3435 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3390 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3392 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S344 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H3476 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H112 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4485
H159 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H132 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5088
S872 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H3471 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S2227 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S2294 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4013 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Adopted, see H4012
S2338 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #94 [YEAS 38 - NAYS 0]
S2349 (Similar To) 2019-09-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4083 (Similar To) 2019-11-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4163
S2368 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - See H4012
S2377 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - See H4012
H5160 (Replaced by) 2020-12-01 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H3352 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3435 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3390 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3392 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S344 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H3476 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H112 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4485
H159 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H132 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5088
S872 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H3471 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S2227 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S2294 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4013 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Adopted, see H4012
S2338 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #94 [YEAS 38 - NAYS 0]
S2349 (Similar To) 2019-09-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4083 (Similar To) 2019-11-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4163
S2368 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - See H4012
S2377 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - See H4012
H5160 (Replaced by) 2020-12-01 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H982 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H982.pdf |