MA H692 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2525
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 66-9)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-09-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2525
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-09-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2525
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to requiring instruction on the Holocaust and genocide in public schools. Education.
Title
Concerning genocide education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-13 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2525 |
2021-05-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/20/2021 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S2516 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S2525 (Replaced by) 2021-10-21 - New draft substituted, see S2557
H4110 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1464 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2781
H538 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied H653
S2557 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 98 of the Acts of 2021
S371 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
S332 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied H653
S315 (Similar To) 2022-05-05 - Accompanied H665
S370 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2525
S383 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S99 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S322 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S323 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H4249 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Text of an amendment, see S2557
S2525 (Replaced by) 2021-10-21 - New draft substituted, see S2557
H4110 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1464 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2781
H538 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied H653
S2557 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 98 of the Acts of 2021
S371 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
S332 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied H653
S315 (Similar To) 2022-05-05 - Accompanied H665
S370 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2525
S383 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S99 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S322 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S323 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H4249 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Text of an amendment, see S2557
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H692 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H692.pdf |