MA S2557 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 99-12-2)
Status: Enrolled on November 24 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-11-24 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning genocide education

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning genocide education

Sponsors

Senate Senate Committee on Ways and MeansHouse Committee on EducationSen. Michael Rodrigues [D]Rep. Jeffrey Roy [D]
Sen. Jason Lewis [D]Sen. Joan Lovely [D]Rep. Carole Fiola [D]Sen. Joanne Comerford [D]
Sen. Cynthia Creem [D]Sen. Bruce Tarr [R]Rep. Brian Ashe [D]Sen. Eric Lesser [D]
Rep. Daniel Carey [D]Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D]Sen. Harriette Chandler [D]Rep. Tram Nguyen [D]
Sen. Brendan Crighton [D]Rep. Richard Haggerty [D]Sen. Anne Gobi [D]Rep. Michael Kushmerek [D]
Sen. Paul Feeney [D]Sen. Walter Timilty [D]Sen. Mark Montigny [D]Sen. Michael Barrett [D]
Sen. Michael Moore [D]Sen. Joseph Boncore [D]Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]Sen. Adam Gomez [D]
Rep. David Linsky [D]Rep. Bradley Jones [R]Rep. Jessica Giannino [D]Rep. Steven Howitt [R]
Rep. Michael Day [D]Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Rep. William Galvin [D]Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D]
Rep. David DeCoste [R]Rep. James Hawkins [D]Rep. David Muradian [R]Rep. Christine Barber [D]
Rep. Christopher Hendricks [D]Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]Rep. David Robertson [D]Rep. Brian Murray [D]
Rep. Patrick Kearney [D]Rep. William Driscoll [D]Rep. Steven Owens [D]Rep. John Rogers [D]
Rep. Danillo Sena [D]Rep. Tricia Farley-Bouvier [D]Rep. Christina Minicucci [D]Rep. Mark Cusack [D]
Rep. Lori Ehrlich [D]Rep. Michelle Ciccolo [D]Sen. John Velis [D]Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D]
Rep. Alice Peisch [D]Rep. Mathew Muratore [R]Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D]Sen. John Cronin [D]
Rep. Thomas Walsh [D]Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D]Rep. Hannah Kane [R]Sen. Michael Brady [D]
Rep. Josh Cutler [D]Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]Sen. Barry Finegold [D]Rep. Alan Silvia [D]
Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R]Rep. Jacob Oliveira [D]Rep. Tami Gouveia [D]Rep. Gerard Cassidy [D]
Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Rep. Mindy Domb [D]Rep. Kay Khan [D]Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]
Rep. Ted Philips [D]Rep. Joseph McKenna [R]Rep. Daniel Cahill [D]Rep. Kate Lipper-Garabedian [D]
Rep. Vanna Howard [D]Rep. Donald Wong [R]Rep. Ruth Balser [D]Rep. Danielle Gregoire [D]
Rep. Peter Capano [D]Sen. Ryan Fattman [R]Rep. Paul Tucker [D]Rep. Edward Coppinger [D]
Sen. Diana DiZoglio [D]Rep. Nika Elugardo [D]Sen. Edward Kennedy [D]Sen. Julian Cyr [D]
Rep. Jon Santiago [D]Sen. Adam Hinds [D]Rep. Rady Mom [D]Sen. James Eldridge [D]
Rep. David Rogers [D]Sen. William Brownsberger [D]Sen. Nick Collins [D]Sen. Cindy Friedman [D]
Rep. Sally Kerans [D]Rep. Patricia Haddad [D]Rep. Paul Schmid [D]Rep. Meghan Kilcoyne [D]
Rep. James Kelcourse [R]Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]Rep. Andres Vargas [D]Rep. Adam Scanlon [D]
Rep. Sean Garballey [D]Rep. Tackey Chan [D]Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D]Sen. John Keenan [D]
Rep. Kathleen LaNatra [D]

Roll Calls

2021-10-21 - Senate - Senate Engrossed Roll Call #97 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-24SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2021-11-24HouseEnacted
2021-11-24SenateEmergency preamble adopted
2021-11-24HouseEmergency preamble adopted
2021-11-17SenateSenate concurred in the House amendment
2021-11-17SenateRules suspended
2021-11-16HousePassed to be engrossed - 157 YEAS to 2 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 116 )
2021-11-16HouseRead third
2021-11-15HouseOrdered to a third reading
2021-11-15HouseRead second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means)
2021-11-15HouseRules suspended
2021-11-15HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting with the amendment (H4249) pending
2021-11-15HouseCommittee recommended ought to pass with an amendment and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2021-10-21HouseRead; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2021-10-21SenatePassed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #97 (Yeas 39 – Nays 0)
2021-10-21SenateRead third
2021-10-21SenateOrdered to a third reading
2021-10-21SenateSubstituted for S2525
2021-10-14SenateRecommended new draft for S2525
2021-10-14SenateReported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

H692 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2525
S2525 (Similar To) 2021-10-21 - New draft substituted, see S2557
S1973 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2525
S365 (Similar To) 2021-09-03 - Hearing scheduled for 09/13/2021 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H4249 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Text of an amendment, see S2557

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback