MA S1973 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2525

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 63-10)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-09-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2525
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to advance and promote genocide education. Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Advancing and promoting genocide education

Sponsors

Sen. Michael Rodrigues [D]Sen. Jason Lewis [D]Sen. Joan Lovely [D]Sen. Joanne Comerford [D]
Sen. Cynthia Creem [D]Sen. Bruce Tarr [R]Sen. Eric Lesser [D]Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D]
Sen. Harriette Chandler [D]Sen. Brendan Crighton [D]Sen. Anne Gobi [D]Sen. Paul Feeney [D]
Sen. Walter Timilty [D]Sen. Mark Montigny [D]Sen. Michael Barrett [D]Sen. Michael Moore [D]
Sen. Joseph Boncore [D]Sen. Adam Gomez [D]Rep. Bradley Jones [R]Rep. Steven Howitt [R]
Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D]Rep. David DeCoste [R]Rep. David Muradian [R]
Rep. Christine Barber [D]Rep. Christopher Hendricks [D]Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]Rep. David Robertson [D]
Rep. Patrick Kearney [D]Rep. Steven Owens [D]Rep. Danillo Sena [D]Rep. Christina Minicucci [D]
Rep. Lori Ehrlich [D]Sen. John Velis [D]Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D]Rep. Mathew Muratore [R]
Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D]Sen. John Cronin [D]Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D]Sen. Michael Brady [D]
Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]Sen. Barry Finegold [D]Rep. Alan Silvia [D]Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R]
Rep. Tami Gouveia [D]Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Rep. Kay Khan [D]Rep. Ted Philips [D]
Rep. Daniel Cahill [D]Rep. Kate Lipper-Garabedian [D]Rep. Vanna Howard [D]Rep. Donald Wong [R]
Rep. Ruth Balser [D]Rep. Peter Capano [D]Sen. Ryan Fattman [R]Rep. Paul Tucker [D]
Sen. Diana DiZoglio [D]Sen. Edward Kennedy [D]Sen. Julian Cyr [D]Sen. Adam Hinds [D]
Rep. Rady Mom [D]Sen. James Eldridge [D]Sen. William Brownsberger [D]Sen. Nick Collins [D]
Sen. Cindy Friedman [D]Rep. Patricia Haddad [D]Rep. Paul Schmid [D]Rep. James Kelcourse [R]
Rep. Andres Vargas [D]Rep. Adam Scanlon [D]Rep. Tackey Chan [D]Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D]
Sen. John Keenan [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-13SenateAccompanied a new draft, see S2525
2021-05-18JointHearing scheduled for 05/20/2021 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-05-17HouseHouse concurred
2021-05-17SenateDischarged to the Joint Committee on Education
2021-03-29HouseHouse concurred
2021-03-29SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Revenue

Same As/Similar To

H692 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2525
H616 (Similar To) 2021-09-03 - Hearing scheduled for 09/13/2021 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S365 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2748
S2525 (Replaced by) 2021-10-21 - New draft substituted, see S2557
S2557 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 98 of the Acts of 2021

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback