MA H689 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-09-03 - Hearing scheduled for 09/13/2021 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish an integrated cultural studies curriculum in schools. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To establish an integrated cultural studies curriculum in our schools

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-03JointHearing scheduled for 09/13/2021 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Education

Same As/Similar To

S2516 (Similar To) 2021-09-09 - Senate receded from its referral to the committee on Public Health and concurred in the referral to the committee on Education
H4110 (Similar To) 2021-10-13 - Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2021 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Virtual Hearing
S329 (Similar To) 2021-06-07 - Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2021 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1464 (Similar To) 2021-04-22 - Hearing scheduled for 05/03/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H538 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied H653
S353 (Similar To) 2021-10-08 - Hearing scheduled for 10/18/2021 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S371 (Similar To) 2021-10-08 - Hearing scheduled for 10/18/2021 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S332 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied H653
S315 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
S1382 (Similar To) 2021-06-09 - Hearing scheduled for 06/22/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S287 (Similar To) 2021-06-24 - Hearing scheduled for 07/06/2021 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S99 (Similar To) 2021-06-23 - Hearing scheduled for 07/07/2021 from 09:30 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S322 (Similar To) 2021-09-03 - Hearing scheduled for 09/13/2021 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback