MA H5052 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H665
Note: Legislation replaced by H5178
Note: Legislation replaced by H5178
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Vetoed on August 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on August 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for diabetes management in schools
Title
Providing for diabetes management in schools
Sponsors
House House Committee on Ways and Means | Rep. Frank Moran [D] | Rep. Christina Minicucci [D] | Rep. Carmine Gentile [D] |
Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D] | Sen. Julian Cyr [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-08-11 | House | Placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2022-08-11 | House | For message, see H5178 |
2022-08-08 | House | Governor returned to the House with veto |
2022-07-30 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2022-07-30 | House | Enacted |
2022-07-29 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-07-28 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-07-28 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-07-28 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-07-28 | House | New draft of H665 |
2022-07-28 | House | Pending new draft of H665 |
2022-07-28 | House | Reported from the committee on House Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H665 (Replaces) 2022-07-28 - New draft substituted, see H5052
S315 (Similar To) 2022-05-05 - Accompanied H665
H5056 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S99 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S322 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S323 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H5178 (Replaced by) 2022-08-11 - See H5052
S315 (Similar To) 2022-05-05 - Accompanied H665
H5056 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S99 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S322 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S323 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H5178 (Replaced by) 2022-08-11 - See H5052
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5052 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5052.pdf |