MA H608 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H653
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-21 - Accompanied H653
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-21 - Accompanied H653
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to requiring carbon monoxide alarms in schools. Education.
Title
Requiring carbon monoxide alarms in schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-21 | House | Accompanied H653 |
2021-05-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/20/2021 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S2493 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H653 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2516 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H4110 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S371 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
S332 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied H653
S99 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S322 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H5052 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5056 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H653 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2516 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H4110 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S371 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
S332 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied H653
S99 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S322 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H5052 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5056 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H608 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H608.pdf |