MA H600 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H3980

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-5)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-07-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3980
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

By Mr. Gentile of Sudbury, a petition of Carmine Lawrence Gentile and others for an investigation by a task force of the effect of school day start times for middle school and secondary school students. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolve authorizing a study of starting times and schedules

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-21HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H3980
2021-05-17JointHearing scheduled for 05/20/2021 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Education

Same As/Similar To

S99 (Similar To) 2021-06-23 - Hearing scheduled for 07/07/2021 from 09:30 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S322 (Similar To) 2021-09-03 - Hearing scheduled for 09/13/2021 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H3980 (Replaced by) 2021-07-21 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2516 (Similar To) 2021-09-09 - Senate receded from its referral to the committee on Public Health and concurred in the referral to the committee on Education
H4110 (Similar To) 2021-10-13 - Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2021 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1464 (Similar To) 2021-04-22 - Hearing scheduled for 05/03/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S383 (Similar To) 2021-06-07 - Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2021 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1247 (Similar To) 2021-06-29 - Hearing scheduled for 07/13/2021 from 10:30 AM-04:30 PM in Virtual Hearing
S357 (Similar To) 2021-06-24 - Hearing scheduled for 07/06/2021 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H538 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied H653
S353 (Similar To) 2021-10-08 - Hearing scheduled for 10/18/2021 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S217 (Similar To) 2021-07-27 - Hearing scheduled for 08/02/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S371 (Similar To) 2021-10-08 - Hearing scheduled for 10/18/2021 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S332 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied H653
S315 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
S1382 (Similar To) 2021-06-09 - Hearing scheduled for 06/22/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S323 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Hearing scheduled for 09/20/2021 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S370 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2525

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback