MA H4437 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 171 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 171 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Michelle Kannler, an employee of the Department of Public Health. Public Service.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Michelle Kannler, an employee of the Department of Public Health
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-25 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 171 of the Acts of 2016 | |
2016-07-21 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2016-07-21 | House | Enacted |
2016-07-21 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2016-07-20 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2016-07-19 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2016-07-19 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-07-19 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2016-07-08 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2016-07-07 | House | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2016-07-05 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-07-05 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-07-05 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-06-30 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-06-20 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules, reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H442 (Similar To) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4299
H723 (Similar To) 2016-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H4669
H724 (Similar To) 2016-07-21 - New draft substituted, see H4536
H1494 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1495 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H4759 (Similar To) 2016-12-19 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H723 (Similar To) 2016-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H4669
H724 (Similar To) 2016-07-21 - New draft substituted, see H4536
H1494 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1495 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H4759 (Similar To) 2016-12-19 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4437 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4437.pdf |