MA H724 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4536
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-21 - New draft substituted, see H4536
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-21 - New draft substituted, see H4536
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to Middlesex Canal Commission members and operations. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to Middlesex Canal Commission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-21 | House | New draft substituted, see H4536 |
2016-07-21 | House | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) |
2016-07-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-07-21 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting with the amendment pending |
2016-07-21 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2016-07-21 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill with the same title, see H4536 |
2016-03-10 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2016-03-07 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2015-10-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H4536 (Replaced by) 2016-11-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 309 of the Acts of 2016
H442 (Similar To) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4299
H723 (Similar To) 2016-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H4669
H1494 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1495 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H725 (Similar To) 2016-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H4671
H4759 (Similar To) 2016-12-19 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H442 (Similar To) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4299
H723 (Similar To) 2016-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H4669
H1494 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1495 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H725 (Similar To) 2016-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H4671
H4759 (Similar To) 2016-12-19 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H724 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H724.pdf |