MA H4759 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-19 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-19 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Marie Visco, an employee of the Department of Public Health. Public Service.
Title
Creating a sick leave bank for Marie Visco
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-19 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-12-19 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-12-19 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-12-19 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-12-12 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-12-08 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2016-12-05 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H442 (Similar To) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4299
H723 (Similar To) 2016-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H4669
H724 (Similar To) 2016-07-21 - New draft substituted, see H4536
H1494 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1495 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H723 (Similar To) 2016-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H4669
H724 (Similar To) 2016-07-21 - New draft substituted, see H4536
H1494 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1495 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4759 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4759.pdf |