MA H4536 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H724
Note: Legislation replaced by H724
Note: Legislation replaced by H724
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on November 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 309 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on November 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 309 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the Middlesex Canal Commission
Title
Relative to the Middlesex Canal Commission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-03 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 309 of the Acts of 2016 | |
2016-10-27 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2016-10-27 | House | Enacted |
2016-10-24 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2016-10-24 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2016-08-25 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-08-22 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2016-07-21 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-07-21 | House | New draft substituted, see H724 |
2016-07-21 | House | Pending new draft of H724 |
2016-07-21 | House | Reported from the committee on House Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H724 (Replaces) 2016-07-21 - New draft substituted, see H4536
H724 (Replaced by) 2016-07-21 - New draft substituted, see H4536
H65 (Similar To) 2015-03-31 - Reported by H3333
H66 (Similar To) 2015-08-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 64 of the Acts of 2015
H3189 (Similar To) 2015-05-04 - Reported by H3353
H3203 (Similar To) 2015-03-30 - House insisted on its amendment
H3773 (Similar To) 2015-09-30 - Published as amended, see H3785
H724 (Replaced by) 2016-07-21 - New draft substituted, see H4536
H65 (Similar To) 2015-03-31 - Reported by H3333
H66 (Similar To) 2015-08-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 64 of the Acts of 2015
H3189 (Similar To) 2015-05-04 - Reported by H3353
H3203 (Similar To) 2015-03-30 - House insisted on its amendment
H3773 (Similar To) 2015-09-30 - Published as amended, see H3785
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4536 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4536.pdf |