MA H4107 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on October 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-10 - Placed on file
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-10 - Placed on file
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Representative Rogers of Cambridge and Senator Chang-Diaz, a joint petition of David M. Rogers and Sonia Chang-Diaz [BACKING TEXT]. [COMMITTEE].
Title
Cannabis Policy Committee Hearing in Western Massachusetts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-10 | House | Placed on file |
Same As/Similar To
H4121 (Similar To) 2019-10-16 - Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H190 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
S1862 (Similar To) 2019-07-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2107 (Similar To) 2020-04-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S208 (Similar To) 2020-08-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2018 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H190 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
S1862 (Similar To) 2019-07-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2107 (Similar To) 2020-04-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S208 (Similar To) 2020-08-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2018 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4107 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4107.pdf |