MA S1862 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish 413 day. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Establishing 413 day
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Hinds [D] | Rep. Natalie Blais [D] | Sen. Eric Lesser [D] | Rep. Mindy Domb [D] |
Sen. Donald Humason [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-30 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2019-04-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in 437 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S208 (Similar To) 2020-08-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S232 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2021 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2107 (Similar To) 2020-04-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2018 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S2023 (Similar To) 2019-12-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H190 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
S2027 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2025 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2952 (Similar To) 2019-11-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4016 (Similar To) 2019-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 50 of the Acts of 2019
S232 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2021 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2107 (Similar To) 2020-04-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2018 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S2023 (Similar To) 2019-12-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H190 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
S2027 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2025 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2952 (Similar To) 2019-11-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4016 (Similar To) 2019-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 50 of the Acts of 2019
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1862 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1862.pdf |