MA S2018 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2552
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide for community-based green infrastructure in Western Massachusetts. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Providing for community-based green infrastructure in Western Massachusetts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2552 |
2019-06-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/18/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H2665 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2925 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S208 (Similar To) 2020-08-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1950 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1913 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
H190 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H1320 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2996 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H1490 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S2552 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H2925 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S208 (Similar To) 2020-08-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1950 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1913 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
H190 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H1320 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2996 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H1490 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S2552 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2018 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2018.pdf |