MA S1950 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to ensure the safety of residents, first responders, and gas workers. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Ensuring the safety of residents, first responders, and gas workers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-25 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2020-06-11 | House | House concurred |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 22, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-18 | House | House concurred |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Thursday June 4, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-11-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H2665 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2925 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S1913 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
H2718 (Similar To) 2020-11-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H5106
S765 (Similar To) 2020-12-29 - Accompanied a study order, see S2991
H2822 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H1320 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2996 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
S430 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
H532 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H1490 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H2925 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S1913 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
H2718 (Similar To) 2020-11-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H5106
S765 (Similar To) 2020-12-29 - Accompanied a study order, see S2991
H2822 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H1320 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2996 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
S430 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
H532 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H1490 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1950 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1950.pdf |