MA H3305 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Hearing scheduled for 04/30/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the penalties for crimes against certain elderly persons. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to penalties for crimes against seniors

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-23JointHearing scheduled for 04/30/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

H3427 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2955 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H1332 (Similar To) 2019-09-17 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
S747 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2580
H1555 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Hearing scheduled for 04/30/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H3917 (Similar To) 2019-10-31 - Hearing scheduled for 11/06/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
S2294 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2324 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2581
S2430 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback