MA S2430 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Replaces legislation S688

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to preserve special needs trusts for disabled seniors. (Senate, No. 2430).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Preserving special needs trusts for disabled seniors

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-02SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2019-12-02SenateNew draft of S688
2019-12-02SenateReported from the committee on Health Care Financing

Same As/Similar To

S688 (Replaces) 2019-12-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2430
S1810 (Similar To) 2019-12-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3138 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2166 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1261 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3199 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback