NH HB1499 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-30 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/26/2024; Chapter 269; eff. 07/26/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-30 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/26/2024; Chapter 269; eff. 07/26/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study the civilian clean energy, community resilience, and conservation corps, and establishing a committee to study the child protection act.
Title
Establishing a committee to study the civilian clean energy, community resilience, and conservation corps, and establishing a committee to study the child protection act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-30 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/26/2024; Chapter 269; eff. 07/26/2024 |
2024-07-15 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 |
2024-07-11 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/13/2024); Senate Journal 18 |
2024-05-31 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2024-2120s (Rep. Vose): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/30/2024 House Journal 15 P. 22 |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-2120s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/23/2024; Senate Journal 15 |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Sen. Carson Floor Amendment # 2024-2120s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2024; Senate Journal 15 |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Special Order to the end of the calendar on 05/23/2024, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/22/2024; Senate Journal 14 |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved to Remove HB 1499 from the Consent Calendar; 05/22/2024; Senate Journal 14 |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/22/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 20 |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Hearing: 04/25/2024, Room 103, State House, 09:50 am; Senate Calendar 16 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Introduced 02/21/2024 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 6 |
2024-02-01 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0102h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/01/2024 House Journal 3 P. 29 |
2024-02-01 | House | Amendment # 2024-0102h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/01/2024 House Journal 3 P. 29 |
2024-01-17 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0102h 01/09/2024 (Vote 18-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 4 P. 16 |
2024-01-03 | House | Executive Session: 01/09/2024 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2024-01-03 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 01/09/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2024-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/08/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-12-11 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 1 P. 22 |