MA H2107 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the creation of a public safety facility improvement fund to assist municipalities and public safety entities. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Establishing a public safety facility improvement fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-02 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-07-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/18/2019 from 09:00 AM-11:00 AM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
S2137 (Similar To) 2020-07-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2806
H2060 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S1861 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2013 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2040 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S1470 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1262 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4974
S2221 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2531
S2223 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
S2289 (Similar To) 2020-12-16 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2301 (Similar To) 2019-08-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 60 of the Acts of 2019
H4020 (Similar To) 2019-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 49 of the Acts of 2019
S2321 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - House concurred
H4070 (Similar To) 2020-10-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5032
H190 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
S2379 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - House concurred
H4179 (Similar To) 2020-07-31 - Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading
S2437 (Similar To) 2020-01-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 15 of the Acts of 2020
S2446 (Similar To) 2021-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 321 of the Acts of 2020
H2060 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S1861 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2013 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2040 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S1470 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1262 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4974
S2221 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2531
S2223 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
S2289 (Similar To) 2020-12-16 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2301 (Similar To) 2019-08-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 60 of the Acts of 2019
H4020 (Similar To) 2019-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 49 of the Acts of 2019
S2321 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - House concurred
H4070 (Similar To) 2020-10-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5032
H190 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
S2379 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - House concurred
H4179 (Similar To) 2020-07-31 - Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading
S2437 (Similar To) 2020-01-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 15 of the Acts of 2020
S2446 (Similar To) 2021-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 321 of the Acts of 2020
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2107 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2107.pdf |