MA H2091 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 87-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Hearing scheduled for 06/08/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Election Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to voter registration. Election Laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Automatically registering eligible voters and enhancing safeguards against fraud

Sponsors

Rep. Peter Kocot [D]Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Rep. Solomon Goldstein-Rose [D]Rep. Denise Provost [D]
Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]Rep. James Arciero [D]Rep. Cory Atkins [D]Rep. Ruth Balser [D]
Rep. Christine Barber [D]Sen. Michael Barrett [D]Rep. Jennifer Benson [D]Rep. Antonio Cabral [D]
Rep. Daniel Cahill [D]Rep. Thomas Calter [D]Rep. James Cantwell [D]Rep. Gailanne Cariddi [D]
Rep. Evandro Carvalho [D]Sen. Sonia Chang-Diaz [D]Rep. Mike Connolly [D]Rep. Edward Coppinger [D]
Rep. Brendan Crighton [D]Rep. Josh Cutler [D]Sen. Julian Cyr [D]Rep. Michael Day [D]
Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]Rep. Diana DiZoglio [D]Rep. Daniel Donahue [D]Rep. Michelle Dubois [D]
Rep. James Dwyer [D]Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D]Rep. Lori Ehrlich [D]Sen. James Eldridge [D]
Rep. Tricia Farley-Bouvier [D]Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D]Rep. Ann-Margaret Ferrante [D]Sen. Linda Forry [D]
Rep. William Galvin [D]Rep. Sean Garballey [D]Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D]Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D]
Rep. Patricia Haddad [D]Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D]Rep. Paul Heroux [D]Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]
Sen. Adam Hinds [D]Rep. Russell Holmes [D]Rep. Kevin Honan [D]Rep. Louis Kafka [D]
Rep. Jay Kaufman [D]Rep. Mary Keefe [D]Rep. Kay Khan [D]Rep. Stephen Kulik [D]
Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Sen. Jason Lewis [D]Rep. David Linsky [D]Sen. Barbara L'Italien [D]
Rep. Jay Livingstone [D]Sen. Joan Lovely [D]Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]Rep. John Mahoney [D]
Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]Rep. Paul Mark [D]Rep. Paul McMurtry [D]Rep. Aaron Michlewitz [D]
Rep. Rady Mom [D]Rep. Frank Moran [D]Rep. Mathew Muratore [R]Rep. James Murphy [D]
Rep. Brian Murray [D]Rep. Harold Naughton [D]Sen. Kathleen O'Connor Ives [D]Rep. James O'Day [D]
Rep. Sarah Peake [D]Rep. Alice Peisch [D]Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D]Rep. David Rogers [D]
Rep. Byron Rushing [D]Rep. Daniel Ryan [D]Rep. Jeffrey Sanchez [D]Rep. John Scibak [D]
Rep. Frank Smizik [D]Rep. Theodore Speliotis [D]Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]Rep. Jose Tosado [D]
Rep. Paul Tucker [D]Rep. Aaron Vega [D]Rep. John Velis [D]Rep. Chris Walsh [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-25JointHearing scheduled for 06/08/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws

Same As/Similar To

S503 (Similar To) 2017-06-07 - Hearing scheduled for 06/13/2017 from 01:00 PM-03:30 PM in 437
S371 (Similar To) 2017-05-25 - Hearing scheduled for 06/08/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S389 (Similar To) 2017-05-25 - Hearing scheduled for 06/08/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S130 (Similar To) 2017-09-12 - Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
S1744 (Similar To) 2017-06-07 - Hearing scheduled for 06/12/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
H2083 (Similar To) 2017-05-25 - Hearing scheduled for 06/08/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback