MA S130 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2304
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-4)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-14 - Report amended by substitution of bill, see S2304
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-14 - Report amended by substitution of bill, see S2304
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to remove fees for security freezes and disclosures of consumer credit reports. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Removing fees for security freezes and disclosures of consumer credit reports
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | Senate | Report amended by substitution of bill, see S2304 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) |
2017-09-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S104 (Similar To) 2018-01-18 - New draft substituted, see S2246
S115 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1338 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
S1339 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1703 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H218 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4584
H925 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H1728 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H1301 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H185 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H35 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4785
H979 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2304 (Replaced by) 2018-04-19 - Accompanied H4241
S2336 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - New draft substituted, see S2610
S2337 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2436
S2357 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H880 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2610 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S115 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1338 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
S1339 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1703 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H218 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4584
H925 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H1728 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H1301 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H185 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H35 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4785
H979 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2304 (Replaced by) 2018-04-19 - Accompanied H4241
S2336 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - New draft substituted, see S2610
S2337 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2436
S2357 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H880 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2610 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S130 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S130.pdf |