MA H2092 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4252

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to utilize the resources of the Department of Revenue to increase voter registration. Election Laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To increase voter registration

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-28HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4252
2017-05-25JointHearing scheduled for 06/08/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws

Same As/Similar To

S1716 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
S1573 (Similar To) 2017-05-10 - Accompanied S1604
S1609 (Similar To) 2017-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S371 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
S389 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
H2083 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H1348 (Similar To) 2017-07-07 - Hearing scheduled for 07/13/2017 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
H4252 (Replaced by) 2018-03-29 - Reported, in part, by H3140

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback