MA S389 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2399

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to expand voting rights. Election Laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To expand voting rights

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-04SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2399
2017-05-25JointHearing scheduled for 06/08/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2017-01-23HouseHouse concurred
2017-01-23SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws

Same As/Similar To

S702 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2468
S12 (Similar To) 2017-05-01 - Placed on file
S1337 (Similar To) 2018-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H648 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
H1426 (Similar To) 2017-07-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H927 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H226 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H3700 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H3745 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H388 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H1296 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
H149 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H2518 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S1738 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H695 (Similar To) 2017-07-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2399 (Replaced by) 2018-04-09 - Reported (in part) by S2069

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback