MA S1337 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish the Correctional Officers' Procedural Bill of Rights. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Establishing the Correctional Officers' Procedural Bill of Rights
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-29 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2017-11-20 | Joint | Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD |
2017-11-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-09-26 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 10/03/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-09-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/03/2017 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
S1366 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1491 (Similar To) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H1321 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2483 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2542 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S1491 (Similar To) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H1321 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2483 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2542 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1337 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1337.pdf |