MA S503 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2496

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to preventing fraud in life and accident and health insurance policies. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to preventing fraud

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-30SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2496
2017-06-07JointHearing scheduled for 06/13/2017 from 01:00 PM-03:30 PM in 437
2017-01-23HouseHouse concurred
2017-01-23SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

S647 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S618 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S592 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S553 (Similar To) 2018-05-21 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1384 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S554 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S555 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H626 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H598 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H1332 (Similar To) 2017-09-13 - Hearing scheduled for 09/19/2017 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in 222
H1372 (Similar To) 2017-09-13 - Hearing scheduled for 09/19/2017 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in 222
H1347 (Similar To) 2017-09-13 - Hearing scheduled for 09/19/2017 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in 222
H2193 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4315
S2496 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback