MA S592 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2496
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to mandated benefits. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to mandated benefits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-30 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2496 |
2017-10-24 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 10/30/2017 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-10-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/30/2017 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S647 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S618 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S553 (Similar To) 2018-05-21 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S554 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S555 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1384 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H543 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H626 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H598 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H1332 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1372 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1347 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2193 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4315
S2496 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4977 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 419 of the Acts of 2018
S618 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S553 (Similar To) 2018-05-21 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S554 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S555 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1384 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H543 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H626 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H598 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H1332 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1372 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1347 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2193 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4315
S2496 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4977 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 419 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S592 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S592.pdf |