MA H4977 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 419 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 419 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to health insurance benefits for certain retirees in the town of Pembroke. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to health insurance benefits for certain retirees in the town of Pembroke
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 419 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2018-12-31 | House | Enacted |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-12-31 | House | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2018-12-20 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-12-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-12-20 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-12-20 | House | Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-12-13 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2018-12-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/11/2018 from 01:00 PM-02:00 PM in A-2 |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-11-21 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S1474 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H1447 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2526 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1435 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1400 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1447 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2526 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1435 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1400 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4977 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4977.pdf |