MA H4320 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Replaces legislation S369
Note: Legislation replaced by H4667

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on March 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-27 - New draft substituted, see H4667
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Automatically registering eligible voters and enhancing safeguards against fraud

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Automatically registering eligible voters and enhancing safeguards against fraud

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-27HouseNew draft substituted, see H4667
2018-06-27HouseRead second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means)
2018-06-27HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting with the amendment pending
2018-06-27HouseReferred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending
2018-06-27HouseCommittee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill with the same title, see H4667
2018-03-22HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2018-03-22HouseNew draft of S369, S373, H2080, H2091, H2098, H2099 and H2105
2018-03-22HouseReported from the committee on Election Laws

Same As/Similar To

H2091 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4320
S369 (Replaces) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4320
H4667 (Replaced by) 2018-06-27 - Published as amended, see H4671
H4671 (Similar To) 2018-07-26 - Reported by H4834
H4834 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 205 of the Acts of 2018

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback