MA S1744 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4481

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to the definition of fraud in public construction bid laws. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the definition of fraud in public construction bid laws

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-10HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4481
2017-06-07JointHearing scheduled for 06/12/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2017-01-23HouseHouse concurred
2017-01-23SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight

Same As/Similar To

S1697 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H2664 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H4481 (Replaced by) 2018-05-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback