MA H1959 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 62-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to access to disposable menstrual products in prisons, homeless shelters, and public schools. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To increase access to disposable menstrual products in prisons, homeless shelters, and public schools

Sponsors

Rep. Jay Livingstone [D]Rep. Christine Barber [D]Rep. Brian Ashe [D]Rep. Ruth Balser [D]
Rep. Jennifer Benson [D]Rep. Natalie Blais [D]Rep. Paul Brodeur [D]Rep. Daniel Cahill [D]
Rep. Tackey Chan [D]Rep. Mike Connolly [D]Rep. Daniel Cullinane [D]Sen. Julian Cyr [D]
Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D]Rep. Mindy Domb [D]Rep. Daniel Donahue [D]
Rep. Paul Donato [D]Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D]Rep. Lori Ehrlich [D]Sen. James Eldridge [D]
Rep. Nika Elugardo [D]Rep. Tricia Farley-Bouvier [D]Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D]Rep. Carole Fiola [D]
Rep. Sean Garballey [D]Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D]Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D]
Rep. Tami Gouveia [D]Rep. Danielle Gregoire [D]Rep. James Hawkins [D]Rep. Stephan Hay [D]
Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D]Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]Rep. Kate Hogan [D]Rep. Kevin Honan [D]
Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D]Rep. Louis Kafka [D]Rep. Mary Keefe [D]Rep. Kay Khan [D]
Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Rep. David Linsky [D]Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]
Rep. Paul Mark [D]Rep. Christina Minicucci [D]Rep. Tram Nguyen [D]Rep. Alice Peisch [D]
Rep. William Pignatelli [D]Rep. Denise Provost [D]Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D]Rep. Maria Robinson [D]
Rep. David Rogers [D]Rep. Jeffrey Roy [D]Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [R]Rep. Jon Santiago [D]
Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]Rep. Jose Tosado [D]Rep. Chynah Tyler [D]Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]
Rep. Aaron Vega [D]Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D]Rep. Susannah Whipps Lee [R]Rep. Bud Williams [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

H1002 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
S151 (Similar To) 2019-07-03 - Hearing scheduled for 07/15/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
H1988 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
S640 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S1308 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2278
H747 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H741 (Similar To) 2019-04-30 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S2278 (Similar To) 2019-07-25 - New draft substituted, see S2296
S2296 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4017 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Referred to the committee on House Bills in the Third Reading

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback