MA S151 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4298

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4298
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to provide increased access to hearing aids. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To provide increased access to hearing aids

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-21HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H4298
2019-07-03JointHearing scheduled for 07/15/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
2019-06-18JointHearing scheduled for 06/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

H726 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S728 (Similar To) 2019-03-27 - Hearing scheduled for 04/11/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
S1936 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H1988 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
H1705 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
H1002 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Hearing scheduled for 10/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
S597 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S1308 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2278
H747 (Similar To) 2019-10-07 - Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H741 (Similar To) 2019-04-30 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S2278 (Similar To) 2019-07-25 - New draft substituted, see S2296
S2296 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4017 (Similar To) 2019-10-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 82 of the Acts of 2019
H4298 (Replaced by) 2020-01-21 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback