MA H1736 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-14 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 15, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Mental Health, Substance Abuse and Recovery Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the establishment of a statewide children’s mental health ombudsman program within the Office of the Child Advocate. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protecting children's mental health services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-14HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday July 15, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-04-23SenateSenate concurred
2020-04-15HouseReporting date extended to Friday May 15, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-02-18SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-05HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday April 15, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-07-08JointHearing scheduled for 07/11/2019 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery

Same As/Similar To

H328 (Similar To) 2019-06-28 - Hearing scheduled for 07/08/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
H1220 (Similar To) 2019-07-16 - Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1
H159 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3352 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Hearing scheduled for 04/30/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H3435 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Hearing scheduled for 04/30/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H3390 (Similar To) 2019-07-16 - Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2
S344 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H3476 (Similar To) 2019-11-25 - Hearing scheduled for 12/03/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H112 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4485
H132 (Similar To) 2019-08-26 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
S872 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H3471 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Hearing scheduled for 04/30/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
S2227 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S2294 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4013 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Adopted, see H4012
S2338 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #94 [YEAS 38 - NAYS 0]
H4083 (Similar To) 2019-11-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4163
S2349 (Similar To) 2019-09-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2368 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - See H4012
S2377 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - See H4012

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback