MA H1513 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5081
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the appointment of court investigators and the admissibility of certain reports in care and protection cases. The Judiciary.
Title
Regarding the appointment of court investigators and the admissibility of certain reports in care and protection cases
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-12 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5081 |
2019-07-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H328 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H1220 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5125
H3352 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3435 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S344 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H3476 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H112 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4485
H132 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5088
S837 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S2227 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S2294 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4013 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Adopted, see H4012
S2338 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #94 [YEAS 38 - NAYS 0]
H4083 (Similar To) 2019-11-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4163
S2368 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - See H4012
S2377 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - See H4012
H5081 (Replaced by) 2020-11-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1220 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5125
H3352 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3435 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S344 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H3476 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H112 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4485
H132 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5088
S837 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S2227 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S2294 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4013 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Adopted, see H4012
S2338 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #94 [YEAS 38 - NAYS 0]
H4083 (Similar To) 2019-11-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4163
S2368 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - See H4012
S2377 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - See H4012
H5081 (Replaced by) 2020-11-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1513 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1513.pdf |