IA SJR7 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-08 - Sent to Secretary of State. S.J. 278.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A joint resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the State of Iowa relating to the right of the people to keep and bear arms. (Formerly SJR 1.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A joint resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the State of Iowa relating to the right of the people to keep and bear arms. (Formerly SJR 1.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3002 be adopted? (Y: 18 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Shall the resolution be adopted? (Y: 29 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - Shall the joint resolution be adopted and agreed to? (Y: 58 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08SenateSent to Secretary of State. S.J. 278.
2021-01-28SenateMessage from House. S.J. 200.
2021-01-28HouseImmediate message. H.J. 244.
2021-01-28HousePassed House, yeas 58, nays 41. H.J. 241.
2021-01-28HousePoint of order withdrawn. H.J. 240.
2021-01-28HousePoint of order raised , Rule 10, decorum in debate. H.J. 240.
2021-01-28HousePoint of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, Speaker resolved the point of order. H.J. 240.
2021-01-28HousePoint of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, Speaker resolved the point of order. H.J. 240.
2021-01-28HousePoint of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, Speaker resolved the point of order. H.J. 240.
2021-01-28HousePoint of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, ruled point well taken. H.J. 240.
2021-01-28HousePoint of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, ruled point not well taken. H.J. 240.
2021-01-28HouseSubstituted for HJR 4. H.J. 239.
2021-01-28HouseRead first time, passed on file. H.J. 235.
2021-01-28HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 230.
2021-01-28SenateImmediate message. S.J. 185.
2021-01-28SenatePassed Senate, yeas 29, nays 18. S.J. 184.
2021-01-28SenateAmendment S-3002 filed, lost. S.J. 183.
2021-01-27SenateFiscal note.
2021-01-27SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 176.
2021-01-27SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 166.

Same As/Similar To

SJR1 (Similar To) 2021-01-27 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SJR 7. S.J. 176.
HSB9 (Related) 2021-01-22 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HJR 4.
HJR4 (Similar To) 2021-01-28 - Withdrawn. H.J. 252.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback