IA HSB9 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-22 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HJR 4.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A joint resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the State of Iowa relating to the right of the people to keep and bear arms.(See HJR 4.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A joint resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the State of Iowa relating to the right of the people to keep and bear arms.(See HJR 4.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-22HouseCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as HJR 4.
2021-01-21HouseCommittee report, recommending passage. H.J. 179.
2021-01-19HouseSubcommittee recommends passage. H.J. 179.
2021-01-13HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 01/19/2021 9:30AM Law Library.
2021-01-13HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 01/19/2021 9:00AM Law Library.
2021-01-12HouseSubcommittee: Holt, Klein and Wessel-Kroeschell. H.J. 71.
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 68.
2021-01-12HouseBy COMMITTEE ON PUBLIC SAFETY

Same As/Similar To

SJR1 (Replaced by) 2021-01-27 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SJR 7. S.J. 176.
HJR4 (Replaced by) 2021-01-28 - Withdrawn. H.J. 252.
SJR7 (Replaced by) 2021-02-08 - Sent to Secretary of State. S.J. 278.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback