IA HJR4 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-28 - Withdrawn. H.J. 252.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A joint resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the State of Iowa relating to the right of the people to keep and bear arms.(Formerly HSB 9.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A joint resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the State of Iowa relating to the right of the people to keep and bear arms.(Formerly HSB 9.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-28 - House - Shall amendment H–1015, to amendment H–1008, be adopted? (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - Shall amendment H–1009 be adopted? (Y: 41 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-01-28 - House - Shall amendment H–1008, as amended, be adopted? (Y: 41 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-28HouseWithdrawn. H.J. 252.
2021-01-28HouseSJR 7 substituted. H.J. 239.
2021-01-28HouseAmendment H-1009 lost. H.J. 239.
2021-01-28HouseAmendment H-1008 lost, as amended. H.J. 238.
2021-01-28HouseAmendment H-1015, to amendment H-1008 adopted. H.J. 237.
2021-01-27HouseAmendment H-1015 filed. H.J. 227.
2021-01-26HouseAmendment H-1008 and H-1009 filed. H.J. 203.
2021-01-25HouseFiscal note.
2021-01-22HouseIntroduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 180.

Same As/Similar To

SJR1 (Similar To) 2021-01-27 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SJR 7. S.J. 176.
HSB9 (Related) 2021-01-22 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HJR 4.
SJR7 (Similar To) 2021-02-08 - Sent to Secretary of State. S.J. 278.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback