IA SJR1 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-27 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SJR 7. S.J. 176.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A joint resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the State of Iowa relating to the right of the people to keep and bear arms.(See SJR 7.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A joint resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the State of Iowa relating to the right of the people to keep and bear arms.(See SJR 7.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-27SenateCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as SJR 7. S.J. 176.
2021-01-21SenateSubcommittee recommends passage.
2021-01-19SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 01/21/2021 10:00AM 217 Conference Room.
2021-01-12SenateSubcommittee: Zaun, Bisignano, and Schultz. S.J. 78.
2021-01-11SenateIntroduced, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 20.

Same As/Similar To

HSB9 (Related) 2021-01-22 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HJR 4.
HJR4 (Similar To) 2021-01-28 - Withdrawn. H.J. 252.
SJR7 (Similar To) 2021-06-08 - Fiscal note.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback