HI SCR93 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR93
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Budget And Finance, Department Of Education, University Of Hawaii, And Office Of Hawaiian Affairs To Submit A Report To The Legislature On All Unspent Federal Funds For Each State Department Or Entity Under Its Respective Jurisdiction.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Budget And Finance, Department Of Education, University Of Hawaii, And Office Of Hawaiian Affairs To Submit A Report To The Legislature On All Unspent Federal Funds For Each State Department Or Entity Under Its Respective Jurisdiction.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3270), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Ruderman, Galuteria, Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-18 2:55PM in conference room 224. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Referred to GVO, WAM. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR93 (Carry Over) 2017-04-07 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 41