HI SCR93 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR93
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-07 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 41
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-07 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 41
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Taxation To Upgrade And Modernize Its Communication System.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Taxation To Upgrade And Modernize Its Communication System.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-07 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 41 |
2017-04-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 441). |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1406) with recommendation of adoption. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-17 9:45AM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported from ETT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1213), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in ETT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-17 3:00PM in conference room 414. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Referred to ETT, WAM. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR93 (Carry Over) 2017-04-07 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 41
HCR86 (Same As) 2017-03-13 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 29
HCR86 (Same As) 2017-03-13 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 29
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=93&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/SCR93_.HTM |