FL S2514 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-13 - Chapter No. 2021-29, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1954 (Ch. 2021-28), SB 2512 (Ch. 2021-39), SB 2500 (Ch. 2021-36)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-13 - Chapter No. 2021-29, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1954 (Ch. 2021-28), SB 2512 (Ch. 2021-39), SB 2500 (Ch. 2021-36)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the Resilient Florida Trust Fund within the Department of Environmental Protection; providing for the purpose of the fund; providing for future review and termination or re-creation of the fund, etc.
Title
Resilient Florida Trust Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#74 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#10 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#10 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | Chapter No. 2021-29, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1954 (Ch. 2021-28), SB 2512 (Ch. 2021-39), SB 2500 (Ch. 2021-36) | |
2021-05-12 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-05-10 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2021-04-08 | House | Message sent to senate |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2021-04-08 | House | Immediately certified |
2021-04-08 | House | Passed; YEAS 118, NAYS 0 |
2021-04-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-08 | House | Substituted for HB 7021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2021-04-07 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-04-07 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2021-04-07 | House | In Messages |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2021-04-07 | Senate | The Senate requests that the House pass the bill as passed by the Senate or agree to include the bill in the Budget Conference |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/07/21 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/01/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-03-26 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/31/21, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Submitted for consideration by Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
S1954 (Related) 2021-05-13 - Chapter No. 2021-28, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2512 (Ch. 2021-39), SB 2514 (Ch. 2021-29), SB 2500 (Ch. 2021-36)
S2512 (Related) 2021-06-03 - Chapter No. 2021-39, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1954 (Ch. 2021-28), SB 2514 (Ch. 2021-29), SB 2500 (Ch. 2021-36)
H7021 (Same As) 2021-04-08 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 2514
H5001 (Similar To) 2021-04-08 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 2500
H5401 (Similar To) 2021-04-08 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 2512
H7019 (Similar To) 2021-04-08 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1954 (Ch. 2021-28), SB 2512 (Ch. 2021-39), SB 2514 (Ch. 2021-29)
S2500 (Similar To) 2021-06-03 - Chapter No. 2021-36, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5011 (Ch. 2021-43), HB 5101 (Ch. 2021-44), HB 5301 (Ch. 2021-45), HB 5601 (Ch. 2021-46), CS/CS/SB 1954 (Ch. 2021-28), SB 2502 (Ch. 2021-37), SB 2504 (Ch. 2021-38), SB 2512 (Ch. 2021-39), SB 2514 (Ch. 2021-29), SB 2516 (Ch. 2021-40), SB 2518 (Ch. 2021-41), SB 7018 (Ch. 2021-42)
S2512 (Related) 2021-06-03 - Chapter No. 2021-39, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1954 (Ch. 2021-28), SB 2514 (Ch. 2021-29), SB 2500 (Ch. 2021-36)
H7021 (Same As) 2021-04-08 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 2514
H5001 (Similar To) 2021-04-08 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 2500
H5401 (Similar To) 2021-04-08 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 2512
H7019 (Similar To) 2021-04-08 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1954 (Ch. 2021-28), SB 2512 (Ch. 2021-39), SB 2514 (Ch. 2021-29)
S2500 (Similar To) 2021-06-03 - Chapter No. 2021-36, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5011 (Ch. 2021-43), HB 5101 (Ch. 2021-44), HB 5301 (Ch. 2021-45), HB 5601 (Ch. 2021-46), CS/CS/SB 1954 (Ch. 2021-28), SB 2502 (Ch. 2021-37), SB 2504 (Ch. 2021-38), SB 2512 (Ch. 2021-39), SB 2514 (Ch. 2021-29), SB 2516 (Ch. 2021-40), SB 2518 (Ch. 2021-41), SB 7018 (Ch. 2021-42)