FL H7021 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1-1)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-08 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 2514
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creates Resilient Florida Trust Fund within DEP; provides for purpose of fund; provides for future review & termination or re-creation of fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resilient Florida Trust Fund/DEP

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-24 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-08HouseLaid on Table, refer to SB 2514
2021-04-08HouseSubstituted SB 2514
2021-04-07HouseAdded to Third Reading Calendar
2021-04-07HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2021-04-07HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-02HouseAmendment 371955 withdrawn
2021-04-02HouseAmendment 371955 filed
2021-04-01HouseBill added to Special Order Calendar (4/7/2021)
2021-03-25HouseAdded to Second Reading Calendar
2021-03-25HouseBill released to House Calendar
2021-03-25HouseReported out of State Affairs Committee
2021-03-24HouseFavorable by State Affairs Committee
2021-03-22HouseAdded to State Affairs Committee agenda
2021-03-11HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2021-03-11HouseReported out of Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-03-11HouseFavorable by Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-03-09House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-03-09HouseAdded to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
2021-03-09HouseNow in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-03-09HouseReferred to State Affairs Committee
2021-03-09HouseReferred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-03-09HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H7019 (Related) 2021-04-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 1954
S1954 (Similar To) 2021-05-13 - Chapter No. 2021-28
H5401 (Related) 2021-04-08 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 2512
S2514 (Same As) 2021-05-13 - Chapter No. 2021-29
S2512 (Similar To) 2021-06-03 - Chapter No. 2021-39

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3800935Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7021
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7021/BillText/Filed/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7021/Amendment/371955/PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7021/Analyses/h7021.ANR.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7021/Analyses/h7021a.ANR.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7021/Analyses/h7021b.SAC.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7021/Analyses/h7021c.SAC.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7021/Analyses/h7021z.EAF.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7021/Analyses/h7021z1.EAF.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=58122&IsPCB=0&BillId=72875
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=59191&IsPCB=0&BillId=72875

Bill Comments 750

feedback