FL H7019 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 1954
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes Resilient Florida Grant Program within DEP to fund costs of community resilience planning; requires DEP to complete data set & assessment, develop annual Statewide Flooding & Sea Level Rise Resilience Plan & submit plan to Governor & Legislature; authorizes local governments, WMDs, & flood control districts to annually submit proposed projects to DEP; authorizes DEP to provide funding to regional resilience entities, subject to appropriation; establishes Florida Flood Hub for Applied Research & Innovation; requires Hub to annually submit report to Governor & Legislature; requires OEDR to include flood control information in assessments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Statewide Flooding and Sea Level Rise Resilience

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-24 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-08HouseLaid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 1954
2021-04-08HouseSubstituted CS/CS/SB 1954
2021-04-07HouseAdded to Third Reading Calendar
2021-04-07HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2021-04-07HouseAmendment 541943 adopted
2021-04-07HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-02HouseAmendment 626709 withdrawn
2021-04-02HouseAmendment 541943 filed
2021-04-02HouseAmendment 626709 filed
2021-04-01HouseBill added to Special Order Calendar (4/7/2021)
2021-03-29HouseAdded to Second Reading Calendar
2021-03-29HouseBill referred to House Calendar
2021-03-25House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
2021-03-25HouseCS Filed
2021-03-25HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2021-03-25HouseReported out of State Affairs Committee
2021-03-24HouseFavorable with CS by State Affairs Committee
2021-03-22HousePCS added to State Affairs Committee agenda
2021-03-11HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2021-03-11HouseReported out of Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-03-11HouseFavorable by Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-03-09House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-03-09HouseAdded to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
2021-03-09HouseNow in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-03-09HouseReferred to State Affairs Committee
2021-03-09HouseReferred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-03-09HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H7021 (Related) 2021-04-08 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 2514
S1954 (Similar To) 2021-05-13 - Chapter No. 2021-28
H901 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
S1252 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Environment and Natural Resources
H5401 (Related) 2021-04-08 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 2512
S2512 (Similar To) 2021-06-03 - Chapter No. 2021-39
S2514 (Similar To) 2021-05-13 - Chapter No. 2021-29
H367 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
380093Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3800933Amended CodeSee Bill Text
403928Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7019
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7019/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7019/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7019/BillText/e1/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7019/Amendment/626709/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7019/Amendment/541943/PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7019/Analyses/h7019.ANR.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7019/Analyses/h7019a.ANR.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7019/Analyses/h7019b.SAC.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7019/Analyses/h7019z.EAF.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7019/Analyses/h7019z1.EAF.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=58121&IsPCB=0&BillId=72874
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=59194&IsPCB=1&BillId=72874

Bill Comments 750

feedback