FL S1954 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-13 - Chapter No. 2021-28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing the Resilient Florida Grant Program within the Department of Environmental Protection; requiring the department to complete a comprehensive statewide flood vulnerability and sea level rise data set and assessment by specified dates; requiring the department to develop an annual Statewide Flooding and Sea Level Rise Resilience Plan and submit the plan to the Governor and Legislature by a specified date; requiring the department to implement a scoring system for assessing projects eligible for inclusion in the plan, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Statewide Flooding and Sea Level Rise Resilience

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-08 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#73 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#33 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate Environment and Natural Resources (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-13 Chapter No. 2021-28
2021-05-12 Approved by Governor
2021-05-10 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2021-04-08HouseMessage sent to senate
2021-04-08SenateOrdered enrolled
2021-04-08HouseImmediately certified
2021-04-08HouseCS passed; YEAS 118, NAYS 0
2021-04-08HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-08HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-08HouseSubstituted for CS/HB 7019
2021-04-07HouseAdded to Second Reading Calendar
2021-04-07House1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
2021-04-07HouseBill referred to House Calendar
2021-04-07HouseIn Messages
2021-04-07SenateImmediately certified
2021-04-07SenateThe Senate requests that the House pass the bill as passed by the Senate or agree to include the bill in the Budget Conference
2021-04-07SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
2021-04-07SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-07SenateAmendment(s) adopted (132074)
2021-04-07SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-01SenateCS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
2021-04-01SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/07/21
2021-04-01SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2021-04-01SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2021-03-31SenateCS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
2021-03-29SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/01/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2021-03-26SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/31/21, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2021-03-18SenateCS by Environment and Natural Resources read 1st time
2021-03-17SenateNow in Appropriations
2021-03-17SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2021-03-15SenateCS by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2021-03-10SenateOn Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 03/15/21, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
2021-03-10SenateIntroduced
2021-03-04SenateReferred to Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations
2021-03-01SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H901 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
S1252 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Environment and Natural Resources
H7019 (Similar To) 2021-04-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 1954
H7021 (Similar To) 2021-04-08 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 2514
H5401 (Similar To) 2021-04-08 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 2512
S2512 (Related) 2021-06-03 - Chapter No. 2021-39
S2514 (Related) 2021-05-13 - Chapter No. 2021-29
H5001 (Similar To) 2021-04-08 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 2500
S2500 (Similar To) 2021-06-03 - Chapter No. 2021-36
H367 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
380093Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3800933Amended CodeSee Bill Text
403928Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1954
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1954/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1954/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1954/BillText/c2/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1954/BillText/e1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1954/BillText/er/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1954/Amendment/753772/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1954/Amendment/366818/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1954/Amendment/132074/HTML
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1954/Analyses/2021s01954.pre.en.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1954/Analyses/2021s01954.en.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1954/Analyses/2021s01954.pre.ap.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1954/Analyses/2021s01954.ap.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1954/Vote/SenateVote_s01954c2033.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1954/Vote/HouseVote_s01954e1073.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1954/Vote/2021-03-15%200330PM~S01954%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1954/Vote/2021-03-31%200100PM~S01954%20Vote%20Record.PDF

Bill Comments 750

feedback