FL H5401 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-08 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 2512
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-08 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 2512
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises & deletes distributions of documentary stamp taxes collected; provides that specified distributions may not be transferred to General Revenue Fund; authorizes revenues in Water Protection & Sustainability Program Trust Fund to be distributed to a specified program.
Title
Documentary Stamp Tax Distributions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - House - House Appropriations Committee (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-08 | House | Laid on Table, refer to SB 2512 |
2021-04-08 | House | Substituted SB 2512 |
2021-04-07 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2021-04-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-07 | House | Amendment 538667 withdrawn |
2021-04-02 | House | Amendment 538667 filed |
2021-04-01 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/7/2021) |
2021-03-31 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2021-03-31 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2021-03-31 | House | Reported out of Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Favorable by Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-29 | House | Added to Appropriations Committee agenda |
2021-03-29 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-25 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-03-25 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7019 (Related) 2021-04-08 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1954 (Ch. 2021-28), SB 2512 (Ch. 2021-39), SB 2514 (Ch. 2021-29)
H7021 (Related) 2021-04-08 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 2514
S1954 (Similar To) 2021-05-13 - Chapter No. 2021-28, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2512 (Ch. 2021-39), SB 2514 (Ch. 2021-29), SB 2500 (Ch. 2021-36)
H5001 (Similar To) 2021-04-08 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 2500
S2512 (Similar To) 2021-06-03 - Chapter No. 2021-39, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1954 (Ch. 2021-28), SB 2514 (Ch. 2021-29), SB 2500 (Ch. 2021-36)
S2500 (Similar To) 2021-06-03 - Chapter No. 2021-36, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5011 (Ch. 2021-43), HB 5101 (Ch. 2021-44), HB 5301 (Ch. 2021-45), HB 5601 (Ch. 2021-46), CS/CS/SB 1954 (Ch. 2021-28), SB 2502 (Ch. 2021-37), SB 2504 (Ch. 2021-38), SB 2512 (Ch. 2021-39), SB 2514 (Ch. 2021-29), SB 2516 (Ch. 2021-40), SB 2518 (Ch. 2021-41), SB 7018 (Ch. 2021-42)
S2514 (Similar To) 2021-05-13 - Chapter No. 2021-29, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1954 (Ch. 2021-28), SB 2512 (Ch. 2021-39), SB 2500 (Ch. 2021-36)
H7021 (Related) 2021-04-08 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 2514
S1954 (Similar To) 2021-05-13 - Chapter No. 2021-28, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2512 (Ch. 2021-39), SB 2514 (Ch. 2021-29), SB 2500 (Ch. 2021-36)
H5001 (Similar To) 2021-04-08 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 2500
S2512 (Similar To) 2021-06-03 - Chapter No. 2021-39, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1954 (Ch. 2021-28), SB 2514 (Ch. 2021-29), SB 2500 (Ch. 2021-36)
S2500 (Similar To) 2021-06-03 - Chapter No. 2021-36, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5011 (Ch. 2021-43), HB 5101 (Ch. 2021-44), HB 5301 (Ch. 2021-45), HB 5601 (Ch. 2021-46), CS/CS/SB 1954 (Ch. 2021-28), SB 2502 (Ch. 2021-37), SB 2504 (Ch. 2021-38), SB 2512 (Ch. 2021-39), SB 2514 (Ch. 2021-29), SB 2516 (Ch. 2021-40), SB 2518 (Ch. 2021-41), SB 7018 (Ch. 2021-42)
S2514 (Similar To) 2021-05-13 - Chapter No. 2021-29, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1954 (Ch. 2021-28), SB 2512 (Ch. 2021-39), SB 2500 (Ch. 2021-36)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
201 | 0205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
201 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 55 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 890 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 5092 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 9073 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |