FL S1774 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creating the "Parental Consent for Abortion Act"; prohibiting a physician from performing an abortion on a minor unless the physician has been presented with consent from the minor's parent or guardian, as appropriate; providing an exception for a medical emergency; authorizing a minor to petition any circuit court in which the minor resides for a waiver of consent required to obtain an abortion, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Parental Consent for Abortion

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Judiciary
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-08SenateNow in Judiciary
2019-04-08SenateFavorable by Health Policy; YEAS 5 NAYS 4
2019-04-03SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 04/08/19, 12:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-13SenateIntroduced
2019-03-08SenateReferred to Health Policy; Judiciary; Rules
2019-03-01SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1778 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
H1335 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
39001117Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback