FL S1778 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing a public records exemption for information that could identify a minor which is contained in a record held by the court relating to the minor's petition to waive consent requirements to obtain an abortion; providing for future legislative review and repeal under the Open Government Sunset Review Act; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.
Title
Public Records/Minor's Petition to Waive Consent/Abortion
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-04-10 | Senate | CS by Health Policy read 1st time |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | CS by Health Policy; YEAS 8 NAYS 1 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 04/08/19, 12:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Filed |