FL H1335 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Reclassifies criminal offense for specified violation; requires physician to obtain notarized written consent of parent or legal guardian before inducing or performing termination of pregnancy of minor; provides exceptions to consent requirement; provides criminal penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Abortion

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#177 (Y: 69 N: 44 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Health Policy
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-24SenateReceived
2019-04-24SenateReferred to Health Policy; Rules
2019-04-23SenateIn Messages
2019-04-17HousePassed; YEAS 69 NAYS 44
2019-04-17HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-17HouseAmendment(s) failed (667633)
2019-04-17HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-11HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/19
2019-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-09HouseFavorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 12 NAYS 6
2019-04-05HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 04/09/19, 2:00 pm, Morris Hall
2019-04-03HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2019-04-03HouseFavorable by Judiciary Committee; YEAS 10 NAYS 6
2019-04-01HouseOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/03/19, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall
2019-03-19HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2019-03-19HouseFavorable by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 4
2019-03-15HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 03/19/19, 8:00 am, Webster Hall
2019-03-08HouseReferred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-04HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1397 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
S1774 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
27511Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3900111Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39001114Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback