FL S1326 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-22 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1315 (Ch. 2021-236), CS/HB 1313 (Ch. 2021-235)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Providing exemptions from public records requirements for secure login credentials, Internet protocol addresses, and geolocation data held by the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles; providing for future legislative review and repeal of the exemptions; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Records/Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Transportation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-22SenateLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1315 (Ch. 2021-236), CS/HB 1313 (Ch. 2021-235)
2021-04-22SenateSubstituted CS/HB 1315
2021-04-22SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-20SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/22/21
2021-04-20SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2021-04-20SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2021-04-19SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/20/21, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
2021-04-15SenateNow in Rules
2021-04-15SenateFavorable by Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
2021-04-14SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/19/21, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2021-04-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/15/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2021-03-12SenateNow in Appropriations
2021-03-12SenateRemaining references corrected to Appropriations; Rules
2021-03-12SenateOriginal reference(s) removed: Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
2021-03-11SenateCS by Transportation read 1st time
2021-03-11SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2021-03-10SenateCS by Transportation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2021-03-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Transportation, 03/10/21, 8:00 am, 110 Senate Building
2021-03-02SenateIntroduced
2021-02-24SenateReferred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2021-02-16SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1324 (Related) 2021-04-22 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1313 (Ch. 2021-235), CS/HB 1315 (Ch. 2021-236)
H1315 (Same As) 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-236; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1313 (Ch. 2021-235)
H1313 (Similar To) 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-235; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1315 (Ch. 2021-236)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1190712Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1326
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1326/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1326/BillText/c1/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1326/Amendment/252740/HTML
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1326/Analyses/2021s01326.pre.tr.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1326/Analyses/2021s01326.tr.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1326/Analyses/2021s01326.pre.ap.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1326/Analyses/2021s01326.ap.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1326/Analyses/2021s01326.pre.rc.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1326/Analyses/2021s01326.rc.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1326/Vote/2021-03-10%200800AM~S01326%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1326/Vote/2021-04-15%200900AM~S01326%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1326/Vote/2021-04-20%200830AM~S01326%20Vote%20Record.PDF

Bill Comments 750

feedback